Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044 /CH0670
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 (SB0688)
Title
Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing and Short-Term Vehicle Rentals - Alterations and Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246
Title
Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152
Title
Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund – Use of Funds and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credits
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 (HB0869)
Title
Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing and Short–Term Vehicle Rentals – Alterations and Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0044 /CH0670 Clean Cars Act of 2021 Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0869 (SB0688) Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing and Short-Term Vehicle Rentals - Alterations and Distribution Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1246 Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Alteration Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0152 Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund – Use of Funds and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credits Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0688 (HB0869) Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing and Short–Term Vehicle Rentals – Alterations and Distribution Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:16 AM
Click to return on the top page