Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252 /CH0075
Title
Tax Sales – Owner–Occupied Residential Property
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348
Title
Baltimore County – Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice – Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners Property Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0571
Title
Montgomery County - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Property Tax Abatement MC 20-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573
Title
Baltimore County – Overdue Property Taxes – Waiver of Interest and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662 (SB0261)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit for Business Entities - State of Emergency
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954 (SB0841)
Title
Property Tax – Solar Energy Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1010
Title
Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Low-Income Housing PG 415-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1042
Title
Baltimore City – Property Tax Credit – Newly Constructed and Substantially Rehabilitated Dwellings
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179 (SB0794)
Title
Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Owner-Occupied Residential Property
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water and Sewer Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1222
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 (SB0778)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320
Title
Baltimore City - Property Taxes - Authority to Set Special Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353
Title
Frederick County - Small Business Property Tax Credit - Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 (HB0662)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit for Business Entities - State of Emergency
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325 /CH0108
Title
Tax Sales – Redemption – Nondelinquent Taxes
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 (HB1279)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB1179)
Title
Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development
Sponsor
Wicomico County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 (HB0954)
Title
Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0956
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit for Business Entities - State of Emergency
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0252 /CH0075 Tax Sales – Owner–Occupied Residential Property Delegate Long 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0348 Baltimore County – Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice – Pilot Program Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0559 Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners Property Tax Credit Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0571 Montgomery County - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Property Tax Abatement MC 20-21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0573 Baltimore County – Overdue Property Taxes – Waiver of Interest and Penalties Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0662 (SB0261) Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit for Business Entities - State of Emergency Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0954 (SB0841) Property Tax – Solar Energy Systems Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0981 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1010 Prince George's County - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Low-Income Housing PG 415-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1042 Baltimore City – Property Tax Credit – Newly Constructed and Substantially Rehabilitated Dwellings Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Ways and Means
HB1168 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1179 (SB0794) Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1217 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Owner-Occupied Residential Property Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1219 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Notice Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1221 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water and Sewer Liens Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1222 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Notice Requirements Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1279 (SB0778) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1320 Baltimore City - Property Taxes - Authority to Set Special Rates Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1353 Frederick County - Small Business Property Tax Credit - Municipal Corporations Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0261 (HB0662) Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit for Business Entities - State of Emergency Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
SB0325 /CH0108 Tax Sales – Redemption – Nondelinquent Taxes Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0778 (HB1279) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0794 (HB1179) Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development Wicomico County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0841 (HB0954) Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0956 Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit for Business Entities - State of Emergency Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:22 PM
Click to return on the top page