Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Public Works

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088 (SB0525)
Title
Electric Distribution System Planning and Required Labor Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388
Title
Prevailing Wage – University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, and St. Mary’s College of Maryland – Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0611 (SB0259/CH0051)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893 /CH0617 (SB0442)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1439 (SB0932/CH0281)
Title
Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact – City of Bowie
Sponsor
Delegate Landis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 /CH0051 (HB0611)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 (HB0893/CH0617)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 (HB0088)
Title
Public Utilities - Energy Distribution Planning and Required Labor Standards
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0932 /CH0281 (HB1439)
Title
Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Bowie
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0088 (SB0525) Electric Distribution System Planning and Required Labor Standards Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0388 Prevailing Wage – University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, and St. Mary’s College of Maryland – Applicability Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0611 (SB0259/CH0051) Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0893 /CH0617 (SB0442) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1439 (SB0932/CH0281) Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact – City of Bowie Delegate Landis 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0259 /CH0051 (HB0611) Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability Senator Feldman 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 51
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0442 (HB0893/CH0617) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds Calvert County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2022 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0525 (HB0088) Public Utilities - Energy Distribution Planning and Required Labor Standards Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0932 /CH0281 (HB1439) Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Bowie Senator Watson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:17 PM
Click to return on the top page