Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Public Works

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0037 /CH0058 (SB0035/CH0057)
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110 /CH0455 (SB0144/CH0456)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174 (SB0095)
Title
Public Utilities – Investor–Owned Utilities – Prevailing Wage
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 (SB0861/CH0731)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043
Title
Local Health Services – Funding and Infrastructure
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131 (SB0612/CH0730)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173 /CH0729
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0072 (HB0002)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035 /CH0057 (HB0037/CH0058)
Title
Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Applicability
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095 (HB0174)
Title
Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144 /CH0456 (HB0110/CH0455)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 /CH0730 (HB1131)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 /CH0731 (HB0813)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869
Title
Statewide Transit Plan – Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension Study
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0037 /CH0058 (SB0035/CH0057) Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 58
Economic Matters
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0110 /CH0455 (SB0144/CH0456) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 455
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0174 (SB0095) Public Utilities – Investor–Owned Utilities – Prevailing Wage Delegate Brooks 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Economic Matters
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0813 (SB0861/CH0731) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1043 Local Health Services – Funding and Infrastructure Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1131 (SB0612/CH0730) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1173 /CH0729 Calvert County - Public Facilities Bond Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0002 /CH0072 (HB0002) Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021 Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
Environment and Transportation
SB0035 /CH0057 (HB0037/CH0058) Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Applicability Senator Feldman 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 57
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0095 (HB0174) Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage Senator Kramer 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0144 /CH0456 (HB0110/CH0455) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 456
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0612 /CH0730 (HB1131) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0861 /CH0731 (HB0813) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond Senator Bailey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0869 Statewide Transit Plan – Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension Study Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:22 AM
Click to return on the top page