Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Public Corporations and Instrumentalities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114 (SB0129)
Title
Access to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Program
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375 (SB0269/CH0346)
Title
Open Meetings Act - Application and Enhanced Requirements (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 /CH0183 (SB0560/CH0184)
Title
Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Student Housing - Applications and Occupancy Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0418 (SB0391/CH0136)
Title
Economic Development – More Jobs for Marylanders Program – Extension and Alterations
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 (SB0630/CH0482)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 (SB0541/CH0039)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799
Title
State and Local Government - COVID-19 - Vaccination by Choice Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 /CH0061
Title
Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944
Title
Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Immunity From Civil Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094 (SB0846)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095 (SB0845)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Rural Business Innovation Initiative Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1479 (SB0885/CH0391)
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Maryland Equity Investment Fund - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129 (HB0114)
Title
Access to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Program
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 /CH0136 (HB0418)
Title
Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders Program - Extension and Alterations
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0453 /CH0322
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Makerspace Initiative Program
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0560 /CH0184 (HB0385/CH0183)
Title
Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Student Housing - Applications and Occupancy Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 /CH0482 (HB0706)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0845 (HB1095)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Rural Business Innovation Initiative Fund
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 (HB1094)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0885 /CH0391 (HB1479)
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Maryland Equity Investment Fund - Established
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0114 (SB0129) Access to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Program Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0375 (SB0269/CH0346) Open Meetings Act - Application and Enhanced Requirements (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act of 2022) Delegate Korman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0385 /CH0183 (SB0560/CH0184) Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Student Housing - Applications and Occupancy Agreements Delegate Lehman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Appropriations
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0418 (SB0391/CH0136) Economic Development – More Jobs for Marylanders Program – Extension and Alterations Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0706 (SB0630/CH0482) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0727 (SB0541/CH0039) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0799 State and Local Government - COVID-19 - Vaccination by Choice Act Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB0897 /CH0061 Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/08/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB0944 Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Immunity From Civil Liability Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1094 (SB0846) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1095 (SB0845) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Rural Business Innovation Initiative Fund Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1479 (SB0885/CH0391) Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Maryland Equity Investment Fund - Established Delegate Lierman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0129 (HB0114) Access to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Program Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0391 /CH0136 (HB0418) Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders Program - Extension and Alterations President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2022 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0453 /CH0322 Economic Development – Maryland Makerspace Initiative Program Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Finance
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0560 /CH0184 (HB0385/CH0183) Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Student Housing - Applications and Occupancy Agreements Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Budget and Taxation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0630 /CH0482 (HB0706) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Office of Resilience Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0845 (HB1095) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Rural Business Innovation Initiative Fund Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 (HB1094) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program - Establishment Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0885 /CH0391 (HB1479) Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Maryland Equity Investment Fund - Established Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 4:31 PM
Click to return on the top page