Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Psychologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Eligible Individuals and Direct Reimbursement for Mental Health Services
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0065
Title
Public Schools - Medical and Psychological Treatment in School-Based Health Centers and Public Schools - Parental Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069
Title
Community Development Administration - Live Near Where You Teach Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 /CH0290 (SB0162/CH0289)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Termination of Residential Lease - Limitation of Liability for Rent
Sponsor
Delegate Mireku-North
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149 /CH0779
Title
Medical Records - Destruction - Notice and Retrieval
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0190 (SB1069)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 (SB0362/CH0717)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405 (SB0365)
Title
Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 /CH0705 (SB0471)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1317
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Use of Reimbursement Funds by Schools
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1401 (SB0499)
Title
State Department of Education - School Psychologist Recruitment Program
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0162 /CH0289 (HB0093/CH0290)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Termination of Residential Lease - Limitation of Liability for Rent
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0241 /CH0393
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362 /CH0717 (HB0352)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0405)
Title
Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 (HB0575/CH0705)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0499 (HB1401)
Title
State Department of Education - School Psychologist Recruitment Program
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0732
Title
Department of Juvenile Services and Maryland Department of Health – Inpatient Program for Children
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1069 (HB0190)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Eligible Individuals and Direct Reimbursement for Mental Health Services Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0065 Public Schools - Medical and Psychological Treatment in School-Based Health Centers and Public Schools - Parental Notice Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0069 Community Development Administration - Live Near Where You Teach Program - Establishment Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2024 - 2:00 PM
HB0093 /CH0290 (SB0162/CH0289) Landlord and Tenant - Termination of Residential Lease - Limitation of Liability for Rent Delegate Mireku-North 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0149 /CH0779 Medical Records - Destruction - Notice and Retrieval Delegate Pippy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Finance
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0184 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0190 (SB1069) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 (SB0362/CH0717) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2024 - 12:30 PM
HB0405 (SB0365) Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Delegate Kaufman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 /CH0705 (SB0471) Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024) Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1317 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Use of Reimbursement Funds by Schools Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1401 (SB0499) State Department of Education - School Psychologist Recruitment Program Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0162 /CH0289 (HB0093/CH0290) Landlord and Tenant - Termination of Residential Lease - Limitation of Liability for Rent Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0241 /CH0393 State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Sunset Extension Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Finance
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 /CH0717 (HB0352) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Budget and Taxation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0365 (HB0405) Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 (HB0575/CH0705) Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024) President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0499 (HB1401) State Department of Education - School Psychologist Recruitment Program Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0732 Department of Juvenile Services and Maryland Department of Health – Inpatient Program for Children Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1069 (HB0190) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - First Responders Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page