Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Psychologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131
Title
Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0461
Title
Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences for Mental Health Needs
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Mental Health Services - Expansion (Counselors Not Cops Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522
Title
Public Schools - School Resource Officers and School Security Employees - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970 /CH0329 (SB0500)
Title
Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Expansion of Mental Health Services and Prohibition of School Resource Officers (Police–Free Schools Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096
Title
Public Schools – School Psychologist Recruitment Program
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1166
Title
Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Reporting and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0042
Title
Public Safety - Police Officers - Screening for Violent Behavior, Aggressive Behavior, and Bias
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355
Title
Family Law – Custody Evaluators – Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0500 (HB0970/CH0329)
Title
Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0131 Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0461 Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences for Mental Health Needs Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 Primary and Secondary Education - Mental Health Services - Expansion (Counselors Not Cops Act) Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0522 Public Schools - School Resource Officers and School Security Employees - Revisions Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0970 /CH0329 (SB0500) Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact Delegate Johnson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1089 Primary and Secondary Education – Expansion of Mental Health Services and Prohibition of School Resource Officers (Police–Free Schools Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1096 Public Schools – School Psychologist Recruitment Program Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1166 Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Reporting and Training Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0042 Public Safety - Police Officers - Screening for Violent Behavior, Aggressive Behavior, and Bias Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0355 Family Law – Custody Evaluators – Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0500 (HB0970/CH0329) Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page