Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Psychiatrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406
Title
Children in Out–of–Home Placements – Placement in Medical Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0374)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – 9–1–1 Specialists
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318
Title
Health Occupations - Mental Health Services - Cultural Competency and Diversity
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467 (SB0994)
Title
Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374 (HB0439)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - 9-1-1 Specialists
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994 (HB1467)
Title
Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0406 Children in Out–of–Home Placements – Placement in Medical Facilities Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Appropriations
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0439 (SB0374) Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – 9–1–1 Specialists Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1318 Health Occupations - Mental Health Services - Cultural Competency and Diversity Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1467 (SB0994) Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0374 (HB0439) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - 9-1-1 Specialists Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0994 (HB1467) Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/29/2022 10:14 AM
Click to return on the top page