Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Protests and Demonstrations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088 (SB0074)
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Prohibition Against Penalization for Seeking Mental Health Services
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198
Title
Criminal Law - Disturbing the Peace - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308 (SB0162)
Title
Courts – Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0753
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074 (HB0088)
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Employee Assistance Programs and Early Intervention Programs
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0162 (HB0308)
Title
Courts - Civil Actions - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0088 (SB0074) Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Prohibition Against Penalization for Seeking Mental Health Services Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0198 Criminal Law - Disturbing the Peace - Prohibited Actions Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0308 (SB0162) Courts – Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0753 Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0074 (HB0088) Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Employee Assistance Programs and Early Intervention Programs Senator Washington 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0162 (HB0308) Courts - Civil Actions - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:10 PM
Click to return on the top page