Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Protection Orders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 (SB0610)
Title
Crimes - Interception of Wire, Oral, or Electronic Communications - Exception for Imminent Danger
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 /CH0705 (SB0471)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0745 (SB0743)
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Stalking and Permanent Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 (SB0753)
Title
Public Safety – Firearm Background Checks, Victim Notification, and the Maryland State Police Gun Center
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0632)
Title
Peace Orders - Visual Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Valentine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267 (SB0905/CH0929)
Title
Public Safety - Extreme Risk Protective Orders - Review of Court Records
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290
Title
Protective Orders - Coercive Control
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1458
Title
Workgroup to Study Extreme Risk Protective Orders (Sagar Ghimire Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314
Title
Juvenile Law - Willful Misconduct of a Minor - Civil Liability of a Parent, Legal Guardian, or Custodian (Parental Accountability Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 (HB0575/CH0705)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0610 (HB0290)
Title
Crimes – Interception of Wire, Oral, or Electronic Communications – Exception for Imminent Danger
Sponsor
Senator Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0632 (HB0911)
Title
Peace Orders - Visual Surveillance
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 (HB0745)
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Crimes of Violence and Stalking
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0753 (HB0869)
Title
Public Safety - Firearm Background Checks, Victim Notification, and the Maryland State Police Gun Center
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0905 /CH0929 (HB1267)
Title
Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders – Review of Court Records
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0290 (SB0610) Crimes - Interception of Wire, Oral, or Electronic Communications - Exception for Imminent Danger Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0575 /CH0705 (SB0471) Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024) Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0745 (SB0743) Family Law - Protective Orders - Stalking and Permanent Protective Orders Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744) Juvenile Law - Reform Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0869 (SB0753) Public Safety – Firearm Background Checks, Victim Notification, and the Maryland State Police Gun Center Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0911 (SB0632) Peace Orders - Visual Surveillance Delegate Valentine 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 (SB0905/CH0929) Public Safety - Extreme Risk Protective Orders - Review of Court Records Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1290 Protective Orders - Coercive Control Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1458 Workgroup to Study Extreme Risk Protective Orders (Sagar Ghimire Act) Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0314 Juvenile Law - Willful Misconduct of a Minor - Civil Liability of a Parent, Legal Guardian, or Custodian (Parental Accountability Act) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 (HB0575/CH0705) Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024) President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0610 (HB0290) Crimes – Interception of Wire, Oral, or Electronic Communications – Exception for Imminent Danger Senator Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0632 (HB0911) Peace Orders - Visual Surveillance Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2024 - 10:00 AM
SB0743 (HB0745) Family Law - Protective Orders - Crimes of Violence and Stalking Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735) Juvenile Law - Reform President 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0753 (HB0869) Public Safety - Firearm Background Checks, Victim Notification, and the Maryland State Police Gun Center Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0905 /CH0929 (HB1267) Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders – Review of Court Records Senator Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 929
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2024 - 2:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:44 PM
Click to return on the top page