Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Protection Orders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 (SB0173)
Title
Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289 /CH0341 (SB0105)
Title
Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105 (HB0289/CH0341)
Title
Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 (HB0242)
Title
Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0242 (SB0173) Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0289 /CH0341 (SB0105) Peace Orders - Workplace Violence Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Judiciary
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0105 (HB0289/CH0341) Peace Orders - Workplace Violence Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0173 (HB0242) Family Law - Emancipation of a Minor and Authorization to Marry Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:29 PM
Click to return on the top page