Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Property Managers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110 /CH0455 (SB0144/CH0456)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239 (SB0073)
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515
Title
Real Property – Candidates – Access to Apartment Buildings
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639 /CH0275 (SB0051/CH0276)
Title
Tri–County Council for Southern Maryland – Property Management – Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051 /CH0276 (HB0639/CH0275)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Property Management - Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 (HB0239)
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144 /CH0456 (HB0110/CH0455)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0110 /CH0455 (SB0144/CH0456) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 455
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0239 (SB0073) State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0515 Real Property – Candidates – Access to Apartment Buildings Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
HB0639 /CH0275 (SB0051/CH0276) Tri–County Council for Southern Maryland – Property Management – Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0051 /CH0276 (HB0639/CH0275) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Property Management - Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0073 (HB0239) State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0144 /CH0456 (HB0110/CH0455) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 456
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:00 PM
Click to return on the top page