Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Property Damage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036 /CH0826 (SB0231)
Title
Insurance - Protections After Loss or Damage to Property
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128
Title
Crimes - Interfering With a Legislative Proceeding
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0243
Title
Civil Actions - Civil Immunity - Educator Intervention
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402
Title
Real Property - Nuisance and Breach of Lease Actions - Rodent Harborage
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430
Title
Firearms - Liability Insurance - Public Wearing and Carrying
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546 (SB0324)
Title
Handgun Permits - Accidental Discharge and Training Requirements - Maryland State Police Gun Center (Firearm Safety Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593
Title
Criminal Law - Destroying Funerary Objects and Cemetery Elements - Statute of Limitations and Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Hutchinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 /CH0414 (SB0575/CH0415)
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146
Title
Courts - Unenforceable Indemnity and Costs of Defense Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1397 /CH0377 (SB0590)
Title
Civil Rights - Discrimination Based on Protected Characteristics and Reproductive Freedom
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0231 (HB0036/CH0826)
Title
Insurance – Protections After Loss or Damage to Property
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314
Title
Juvenile Law - Willful Misconduct of a Minor - Civil Liability of a Parent, Legal Guardian, or Custodian (Parental Accountability Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 (HB0546)
Title
Handgun Permits - Accidental Discharge and Training Requirements - Maryland State Police Gun Center (Firearm Safety Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0575 /CH0415 (HB0664/CH0414)
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 (HB1397/CH0377)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination - Protected Characteristics
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0036 /CH0826 (SB0231) Insurance - Protections After Loss or Damage to Property Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 826
Economic Matters
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0128 Crimes - Interfering With a Legislative Proceeding Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0137 /CH0243 Civil Actions - Civil Immunity - Educator Intervention Delegate Grammer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0402 Real Property - Nuisance and Breach of Lease Actions - Rodent Harborage Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0430 Firearms - Liability Insurance - Public Wearing and Carrying Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0546 (SB0324) Handgun Permits - Accidental Discharge and Training Requirements - Maryland State Police Gun Center (Firearm Safety Act of 2024) Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0593 Criminal Law - Destroying Funerary Objects and Cemetery Elements - Statute of Limitations and Prohibition Delegate Hutchinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0664 /CH0414 (SB0575/CH0415) Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1146 Courts - Unenforceable Indemnity and Costs of Defense Agreements Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1397 /CH0377 (SB0590) Civil Rights - Discrimination Based on Protected Characteristics and Reproductive Freedom Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Economic Matters
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
SB0231 (HB0036/CH0826) Insurance – Protections After Loss or Damage to Property Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Finance
1/24/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0314 Juvenile Law - Willful Misconduct of a Minor - Civil Liability of a Parent, Legal Guardian, or Custodian (Parental Accountability Act) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0324 (HB0546) Handgun Permits - Accidental Discharge and Training Requirements - Maryland State Police Gun Center (Firearm Safety Act of 2024) Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 10:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2024 - 10:30 AM
SB0575 /CH0415 (HB0664/CH0414) Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) Senator Corderman 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0590 (HB1397/CH0377) Human Relations - Discrimination - Protected Characteristics Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2024 - 10:00 AM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page