Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Property Damage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438 (SB0443)
Title
Crimes – Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498
Title
First Amendment Activities and Associations - Use of Vehicle to Interfere or Damage Property
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574
Title
Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 8–21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 (SB0580)
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0438)
Title
Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 (HB0641)
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0438 (SB0443) Crimes – Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021) Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0498 First Amendment Activities and Associations - Use of Vehicle to Interfere or Damage Property Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0574 Montgomery County Stable Homes Act MC 8–21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0641 (SB0580) Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0443 (HB0438) Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0580 (HB0641) Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/19/2021 7:48 PM
Click to return on the top page