Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Program Open Space

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031 (SB0791)
Title
Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1332 (SB0680)
Title
State and Local Parks - Playground Accessibility - Communication Boards
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035
Title
Charles County - Program Open Space - General Assembly Approval
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056
Title
Program Open Space - Local Plans and Programs - General Assembly Approval
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0128
Title
Charles County - Program Open Space - Waldorf Core Zone
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 /CH0087
Title
Program Open Space - Local Projects - Federal Funds
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680 (HB1332)
Title
State and Local Parks – Playground Accessibility – Communication Boards
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB1031)
Title
Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1031 (SB0791) Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1332 (SB0680) State and Local Parks - Playground Accessibility - Communication Boards Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
SB0035 Charles County - Program Open Space - General Assembly Approval Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0056 Program Open Space - Local Plans and Programs - General Assembly Approval Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0128 Charles County - Program Open Space - Waldorf Core Zone Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0178 /CH0087 Program Open Space - Local Projects - Federal Funds Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2022 - 2:30 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2022 - 3:00 PM
SB0680 (HB1332) State and Local Parks – Playground Accessibility – Communication Boards Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0791 (HB1031) Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 9:55 AM
Click to return on the top page