Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Privatization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0416 (SB0399)
Title
State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009 /CH0514
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Study
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 /CH0448 (HB0582)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0399 (HB0416)
Title
State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0416 (SB0399) State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0009 /CH0514 Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Study Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 514
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0059 /CH0448 (HB0582) Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - Civil Penalties Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0399 (HB0416) State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 11:16 AM
Click to return on the top page