Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Printing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0190 (SB0157)
Title
Procurement – Specialized Printing Services Contracts – Board of Public Works Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 /CH0287 (SB0658/CH0288)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management – Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9–1–1 Board
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1038 (SB0747)
Title
State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345
Title
Mail-In Voting - Certification of Assistance, Design of Materials, and Ballot Curing
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0157 (HB0190)
Title
Procurement – Specialized Printing Services Contracts – Board of Public Works Approval
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 /CH0288 (HB0990/CH0287)
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9-1-1 Board
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 (HB1038)
Title
State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0190 (SB0157) Procurement – Specialized Printing Services Contracts – Board of Public Works Approval Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0990 /CH0287 (SB0658/CH0288) Maryland Department of Emergency Management – Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9–1–1 Board Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1038 (SB0747) State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1345 Mail-In Voting - Certification of Assistance, Design of Materials, and Ballot Curing Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0157 (HB0190) Procurement – Specialized Printing Services Contracts – Board of Public Works Approval Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0658 /CH0288 (HB0990/CH0287) Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9-1-1 Board Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0747 (HB1038) State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:27 PM
Click to return on the top page