Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pretrial Detention or Release

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Crimes – Firearms – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0115 /CH0758 (SB0004)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Notification of Release From Confinement (Jaycee Webster Victims' Rights Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 /CH0099 (SB0251/CH0100)
Title
Correctional Services - Division of Pretrial Detention and Services - Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310 (SB0044)
Title
Safe Communities Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 /CH0444
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings and Criminal Procedure - Technical Corrections - References to Intellectual Disability
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474
Title
Criminal Procedure - Probation, Parole, and Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0614 (SB0468/CH0893)
Title
Criminal Law – Private Home Detention Monitoring – Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0927
Title
Juvenile Law - Expedited Pretrial Status Hearing
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 (HB0115/CH0758)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Notification of Release From Confinement (Jaycee Webster Victims' Rights Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044 (HB0310)
Title
Safe Communities Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0100 (HB0222/CH0099)
Title
Correctional Services - Division of Pretrial Detention and Services - Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 /CH0893 (HB0614)
Title
Criminal Law - Private Home Detention Monitoring - Notification
Sponsor
Senator McCray
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1098 /CH0712
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Sexual Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0041 Crimes – Firearms – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2024) Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0087 Criminal Law - Death Penalty Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0115 /CH0758 (SB0004) Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Notification of Release From Confinement (Jaycee Webster Victims' Rights Act) Delegate Kaufman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758
Judiciary
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0222 /CH0099 (SB0251/CH0100) Correctional Services - Division of Pretrial Detention and Services - Facilities Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0310 (SB0044) Safe Communities Act of 2024 Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0432 /CH0444 Courts and Judicial Proceedings and Criminal Procedure - Technical Corrections - References to Intellectual Disability Delegate Kaufman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0474 Criminal Procedure - Probation, Parole, and Pretrial Release Delegate Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0614 (SB0468/CH0893) Criminal Law – Private Home Detention Monitoring – Notification Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0814 /CH0735 (SB0744) Juvenile Law - Reform Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0927 Juvenile Law - Expedited Pretrial Status Hearing Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0004 (HB0115/CH0758) Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Notification of Release From Confinement (Jaycee Webster Victims' Rights Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0044 (HB0310) Safe Communities Act of 2024 Senator Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0251 /CH0100 (HB0222/CH0099) Correctional Services - Division of Pretrial Detention and Services - Facilities Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0468 /CH0893 (HB0614) Criminal Law - Private Home Detention Monitoring - Notification Senator McCray 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 893
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0744 (HB0814/CH0735) Juvenile Law - Reform President 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1098 /CH0712 Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Sexual Offenses Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 712
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:42 PM
Click to return on the top page