Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pretrial Detention or Release

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime Involving a Handgun
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294 (SB0165)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0423 (SB0396)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441 /CH0520 (SB0586/CH0521)
Title
Baltimore City - Pretrial Release of Defendant - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0785 /CH0522 (SB0602)
Title
Courts - Baltimore City Jobs Court Pilot Program and Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confinement
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1011 (SB0704/CH0544)
Title
Conditions of Pretrial Release – Home Detention Monitoring – Alterations and Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime of Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113
Title
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release Hearings - Hearsay Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429 (SB0763/CH0141)
Title
Collection and Publication of Criminal Case and Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165 (HB0294)
Title
Juvenile Court – Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212
Title
Correctional Officer - Employment - Age Requirement
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0396 (HB0423)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586 /CH0521 (HB0441/CH0520)
Title
Criminal Procedure and Public Safety - Courts and Criminal Justice in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0602 (HB0785/CH0522)
Title
Baltimore City – District Court – Jobs Court Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 /CH0041
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0704 /CH0544 (HB1011)
Title
Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring - Alterations and Extension
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429)
Title
Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0207 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime Involving a Handgun Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0294 (SB0165) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0423 (SB0396) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0441 /CH0520 (SB0586/CH0521) Baltimore City - Pretrial Release of Defendant - Notice Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 520
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0785 /CH0522 (SB0602) Courts - Baltimore City Jobs Court Pilot Program and Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 522
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB0877 Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confinement Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1011 (SB0704/CH0544) Conditions of Pretrial Release – Home Detention Monitoring – Alterations and Extension Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1065 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime of Violence Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 Criminal Law - Pretrial Release Hearings - Hearsay Evidence Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1429 (SB0763/CH0141) Collection and Publication of Criminal Case and Prosecutorial Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0165 (HB0294) Juvenile Court – Jurisdiction Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0212 Correctional Officer - Employment - Age Requirement Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0396 (HB0423) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0586 /CH0521 (HB0441/CH0520) Criminal Procedure and Public Safety - Courts and Criminal Justice in Baltimore City Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 521
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0602 (HB0785/CH0522) Baltimore City – District Court – Jobs Court Pilot Program Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0691 /CH0041 Juvenile Justice Reform Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 41
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0704 /CH0544 (HB1011) Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring - Alterations and Extension Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 544
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429) Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 4:51 PM
Click to return on the top page