Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Pretrial Detention or Release

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0126 (SB0229)
Title
Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 (SB0023)
Title
Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502 (SB0456)
Title
Office of the State’s Attorney – Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1072 (SB0750)
Title
Charles County – Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs – Authorization
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1187 (SB0853)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 (HB0316)
Title
Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229 (HB0126)
Title
Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 (HB0502)
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525
Title
Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services and State Board of Elections- Centralized Booking Facility - Ballot Drop Box
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 (HB1072)
Title
Charles County - Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs - Authorization
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852
Title
Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 (HB1187)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform Council Extension and Grant Funding
Sponsor
Senator Carter
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0126 (SB0229) Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0316 (SB0023) Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0502 (SB0456) Office of the State’s Attorney – Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1072 (SB0750) Charles County – Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs – Authorization Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1187 (SB0853) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0023 (HB0316) Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0229 (HB0126) Public Safety – Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund – Extension and Program Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0456 (HB0502) Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0525 Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services and State Board of Elections- Centralized Booking Facility - Ballot Drop Box Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0750 (HB1072) Charles County - Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs - Authorization Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Judiciary
SB0852 Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021) Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0853 (HB1187) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform Council Extension and Grant Funding Senator Carter 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 9:37 AM
Click to return on the top page