Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Personal Protective Equipment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0138 (SB0273/CH0139)
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0364 /CH0012 (SB0488/CH0014)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Medical Devices - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575
Title
Public Safety – Emergency Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128
Title
Public Health – Secretary of Health – Indoor Masking Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267
Title
State or Local Elected Officials and Governmental Entities - Face Covering Requirements - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338
Title
Face Mask Requirements - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1379
Title
Hospitals, Related Institutions, and Hospice Facilities - COVID-19 and Other Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0139 (HB0275/CH0138)
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0488 /CH0014 (HB0364/CH0012)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Medical Devices and Products - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934
Title
County Boards of Education - Face Coverings - Authority to Require Use
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0275 /CH0138 (SB0273/CH0139) Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act) Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0364 /CH0012 (SB0488/CH0014) Sales and Use Tax - Medical Devices - Exemption Delegate Henson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Ways and Means
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0575 Public Safety – Emergency Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1128 Public Health – Secretary of Health – Indoor Masking Orders Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Health and Government Operations
HB1267 State or Local Elected Officials and Governmental Entities - Face Covering Requirements - Prohibition Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1338 Face Mask Requirements - Prohibition Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1379 Hospitals, Related Institutions, and Hospice Facilities - COVID-19 and Other Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Visitation Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0273 /CH0139 (HB0275/CH0138) Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0488 /CH0014 (HB0364/CH0012) Sales and Use Tax - Medical Devices and Products - Exemption Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0934 County Boards of Education - Face Coverings - Authority to Require Use Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page