Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Power Plants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0680 /CH0644 (SB0536/CH0645)
Title
Environment - Nuclear Power Plants - Emergency Preparedness (Radiation and Emergency Preparedness and Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682 (SB0696)
Title
Energy Generation Projects - Labor and Minority Business Enterprise Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0820 (SB0805)
Title
Nuclear Energy Development Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Wu
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046 (SB1025)
Title
Public Utilities - Distributed Generation Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112
Title
Public Service Commission - Energy Storage Devices - Acquisition and Deployment
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193 (SB1122)
Title
Environment - Coal Combustion By-Products
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221 (SB0788)
Title
Battery Storage and Solar Arrays Safety Training Grant Program and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1393 /CH0540
Title
Electric System Planning - Scope and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001 /CH0537 (HB0267)
Title
Electricity and Gas - Retail Supply - Regulation and Consumer Protection
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474 /CH0411 (HB0579)
Title
Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Related Approvals - Definition of Generating Station (Critical Infrastructure Streamlining Act of 2024)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 /CH0949 (HB0468/CH0950)
Title
Commission to Advance Lithium–Ion Battery Safety in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0536 /CH0645 (HB0680/CH0644)
Title
Environment - Nuclear Power Plants - Emergency Preparedness (Radiation and Emergency Preparedness and Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0696 (HB0682)
Title
Energy Generation Projects - Labor and Minority Business Enterprise Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788 (HB1221)
Title
Battery Storage and Solar Arrays Safety Training Grant Program and Fund
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB0820)
Title
Nuclear Energy Development Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0959 /CH0475 (HB1256/CH0476)
Title
Electricity - Tariffs, Distributed Energy Resources, and Electric Distribution System Support Services (Distributed Renewable Integration and Vehicle Electrification (DRIVE) Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1025 (HB1046)
Title
Public Utilities – Distributed Generation Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1122 (HB1193)
Title
Environment - Coal Combustion By-Products
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0680 /CH0644 (SB0536/CH0645) Environment - Nuclear Power Plants - Emergency Preparedness (Radiation and Emergency Preparedness and Protection Act) Delegate Morgan, T. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Economic Matters
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0682 (SB0696) Energy Generation Projects - Labor and Minority Business Enterprise Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0820 (SB0805) Nuclear Energy Development Task Force Delegate Wu 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 (SB1025) Public Utilities - Distributed Generation Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1112 Public Service Commission - Energy Storage Devices - Acquisition and Deployment Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1193 (SB1122) Environment - Coal Combustion By-Products Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1221 (SB0788) Battery Storage and Solar Arrays Safety Training Grant Program and Fund Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1393 /CH0540 Electric System Planning - Scope and Funding Delegate Crosby 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Economic Matters
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0001 /CH0537 (HB0267) Electricity and Gas - Retail Supply - Regulation and Consumer Protection Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/25/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0474 /CH0411 (HB0579) Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Related Approvals - Definition of Generating Station (Critical Infrastructure Streamlining Act of 2024) President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0532 /CH0949 (HB0468/CH0950) Commission to Advance Lithium–Ion Battery Safety in Maryland Senator Gallion 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 949
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Environment and Transportation
SB0536 /CH0645 (HB0680/CH0644) Environment - Nuclear Power Plants - Emergency Preparedness (Radiation and Emergency Preparedness and Protection Act) Senator Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0696 (HB0682) Energy Generation Projects - Labor and Minority Business Enterprise Requirements Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0788 (HB1221) Battery Storage and Solar Arrays Safety Training Grant Program and Fund Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0805 (HB0820) Nuclear Energy Development Task Force Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0959 /CH0475 (HB1256/CH0476) Electricity - Tariffs, Distributed Energy Resources, and Electric Distribution System Support Services (Distributed Renewable Integration and Vehicle Electrification (DRIVE) Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1025 (HB1046) Public Utilities – Distributed Generation Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1122 (HB1193) Environment - Coal Combustion By-Products Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:46 PM
Click to return on the top page