Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Power of Attorney

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0870
Title
Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act – Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261 /CH0686 (SB0820)
Title
Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives – Electronic Execution
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 /CH0513 (SB0700)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills - Custodianship
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0327 /CH0311
Title
Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB1266/CH0513)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills - Custodianship
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820 (HB1261/CH0686)
Title
Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives - Electronic Execution
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0870 Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act – Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1261 /CH0686 (SB0820) Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives – Electronic Execution Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1266 /CH0513 (SB0700) Estates and Trusts - Wills - Custodianship Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0327 /CH0311 Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0700 (HB1266/CH0513) Estates and Trusts - Wills - Custodianship Senator West 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0820 (HB1261/CH0686) Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives - Electronic Execution Senator West 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page