Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Ports

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 /CH0671 (SB0107/CH0672)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 /CH0672 (HB0685/CH0671)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230
Title
Maryland Port Administration - Land Acquisition and Payment to Counties
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0685 /CH0671 (SB0107/CH0672) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671
Economic Matters
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0107 /CH0672 (HB0685/CH0671) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0230 Maryland Port Administration - Land Acquisition and Payment to Counties Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page