Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Political Parties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202
Title
Election Law - Presidential Electors - Selection and Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335
Title
Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339
Title
Legislative Districts - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts)
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballot Envelopes - Party Affiliation
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930
Title
Family Law - Removal of Child From Home - Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037
Title
Election Law - Websites - Reporting of Political Censorship
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1038 (SB0747)
Title
State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1047
Title
Mail–In Voting Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1145
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Requests and Signature Verification
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314
Title
Business Regulation – Social Media Websites – Censored Speech
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343 /CH0685
Title
Anne Arundel County – Party Central Committees – Republican Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 /CH0647
Title
Campaign Finance - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 (HB1038)
Title
State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773
Title
Constitutional Amendment - General Assembly - Standing Committee Appointments
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831
Title
Election Reform Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0202 Election Law - Presidential Electors - Selection and Voting Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0335 Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibitions Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0339 Legislative Districts - Standards Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0410 Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts) Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/22/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0746 Election Law - Absentee Ballot Envelopes - Party Affiliation Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0930 Family Law - Removal of Child From Home - Meetings Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1037 Election Law - Websites - Reporting of Political Censorship Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1038 (SB0747) State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1047 Mail–In Voting Enhancement Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Refuses to Recede
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1145 Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Requests and Signature Verification Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1314 Business Regulation – Social Media Websites – Censored Speech Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1343 /CH0685 Anne Arundel County – Party Central Committees – Republican Requirements Delegate Kipke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 /CH0647 Campaign Finance - Revisions Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 647
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0747 (HB1038) State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0773 Constitutional Amendment - General Assembly - Standing Committee Appointments Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Rules
3/05/2021 - 11:30 AM
SB0831 Election Reform Act of 2021 Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page