Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Political Committees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017 /CH0109
Title
Campaign Finance – Recurring Contributions and Donations – Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340 (SB0015/CH0642)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721
Title
Election Law - Political Clubs
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037 (SB0262)
Title
Higher Education – Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships – Qualifications and Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162
Title
Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 /CH0642 (HB0340)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 (HB1037)
Title
Higher Education – Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships – Qualifications and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 /CH0109 Campaign Finance – Recurring Contributions and Donations – Requirements Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Ways and Means
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0340 (SB0015/CH0642) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Rules
HB0721 Election Law - Political Clubs Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1037 (SB0262) Higher Education – Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships – Qualifications and Limitations Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1162 Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 /CH0642 (HB0340) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Enforcement Senator Jackson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0262 (HB1037) Higher Education – Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships – Qualifications and Limitations Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:14 PM
Click to return on the top page