Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Political Committees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576
Title
Election Law - Political Clubs
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0949
Title
Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1145
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Requests and Signature Verification
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343 /CH0685
Title
Anne Arundel County – Party Central Committees – Republican Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 /CH0647
Title
Campaign Finance - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0576 Election Law - Political Clubs Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0949 Campaign Finance - Collections by Membership Entities - Noncampaign Political Activity Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1145 Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Requests and Signature Verification Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1343 /CH0685 Anne Arundel County – Party Central Committees – Republican Requirements Delegate Kipke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 /CH0647 Campaign Finance - Revisions Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 647
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page