Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Political Candidates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0014 (SB0271/CH0430)
Title
Election Law - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0080 (SB0812)
Title
Election Law - Party and Elected Public Offices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182
Title
Districting - Single Member Districts and Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment Convention
Sponsor
Delegate Bouchat
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331
Title
Election Law - Candidate Expenditures - Campaign-Related Caregiving Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0412
Title
General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0677 (SB0023)
Title
Orphans' Court Judges - Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0792 (SB0016)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Draft Committees and Exploratory Committees
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872
Title
Election Law – Campaign Materials – Disclosure of Use of Synthetic Media
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1514
Title
Elections - Ranked-Choice Voting - Contests for Presidential Nomination
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016 (HB0792)
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Draft Committees and Exploratory Committees
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 (HB0677)
Title
Orphans’ Court Judges – Elections
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029
Title
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 /CH0430 (HB0014)
Title
Election Law - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493
Title
Elections – Ranked–Choice Voting – Contests for Presidential Nomination in 2028
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 (HB0080)
Title
Election Law - Party and Elected Public Offices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978
Title
Election Law - Synthetic Media - Disclosure and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0014 (SB0271/CH0430) Election Law - Revisions Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Ways and Means
1/25/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0080 (SB0812) Election Law - Party and Elected Public Offices - Prohibition Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Ways and Means
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0182 Districting - Single Member Districts and Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment Convention Delegate Bouchat 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0331 Election Law - Candidate Expenditures - Campaign-Related Caregiving Expenses Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0412 General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Delegate Foley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0677 (SB0023) Orphans' Court Judges - Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0792 (SB0016) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Draft Committees and Exploratory Committees Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0872 Election Law – Campaign Materials – Disclosure of Use of Synthetic Media Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1514 Elections - Ranked-Choice Voting - Contests for Presidential Nomination Delegate Fair 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0016 (HB0792) Election Law - Campaign Finance - Draft Committees and Exploratory Committees Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0023 (HB0677) Orphans’ Court Judges – Elections Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judicial Proceedings
1/11/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0029 General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0271 /CH0430 (HB0014) Election Law - Revisions Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0493 Elections – Ranked–Choice Voting – Contests for Presidential Nomination in 2028 Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/04/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0812 (HB0080) Election Law - Party and Elected Public Offices - Prohibition Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0978 Election Law - Synthetic Media - Disclosure and Regulation Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/15/2024 2:07 PM
Click to return on the top page