Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Police Conduct

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0558)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Body-Worn Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168
Title
Washington County - County Administrative Charging Committee - Composition
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249
Title
Attorney General - Wrongful Convictions - Investigations
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463
Title
Civil Rights - Violation of Rights - Governmental Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
State Government - Attorney General - Independent Investigations Division
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946
Title
Washington County – Police Administrative Charging Committee
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 (SB0441)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board and Police Accountability Board
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012
Title
Police Immunity and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1042
Title
Public Information Act – Police Officers – Unfounded Complaints
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1044 (SB0752)
Title
Public Safety - Use of Force Incident Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184
Title
Police Accountability Boards and Administrative Charging Committees - Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1373
Title
Attorney General and State's Attorney - Law Enforcement - Conflict of Interest
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031
Title
Public Information Act – Inspection of Records From Body–Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0309
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board - Police Accountability Board
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 (HB0991)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB0162)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Body-Worn Cameras
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB1044)
Title
Public Safety – Use of Force Incident Reports
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429)
Title
Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777 /CH0536
Title
Task Force to Study Public Information Act Requests Made to Law Enforcement - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0864
Title
Public Safety - Police Officers - Emergency Termination
Sponsor
Senator McCray
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0896
Title
State Government - Attorney General - Independent Investigations Division
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949
Title
Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 (SB0558) Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Body-Worn Cameras Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0168 Washington County - County Administrative Charging Committee - Composition Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0249 Attorney General - Wrongful Convictions - Investigations Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0463 Civil Rights - Violation of Rights - Governmental Liability Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0638 State Government - Attorney General - Independent Investigations Division Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0946 Washington County – Police Administrative Charging Committee Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0991 (SB0441) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board and Police Accountability Board Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1012 Police Immunity and Accountability Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1042 Public Information Act – Police Officers – Unfounded Complaints Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1044 (SB0752) Public Safety - Use of Force Incident Reports Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 Police Accountability Boards and Administrative Charging Committees - Municipal Corporations Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1373 Attorney General and State's Attorney - Law Enforcement - Conflict of Interest Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0031 Public Information Act – Inspection of Records From Body–Worn Digital Recording Devices Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0309 Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board - Police Accountability Board Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0389 Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2022 - 9:00 AM
SB0441 (HB0991) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 (HB0162) Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Body-Worn Cameras Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0752 (HB1044) Public Safety – Use of Force Incident Reports Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429) Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0777 /CH0536 Task Force to Study Public Information Act Requests Made to Law Enforcement - Establishment Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 536
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0864 Public Safety - Police Officers - Emergency Termination Senator McCray 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0896 State Government - Attorney General - Independent Investigations Division Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0949 Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 4:51 PM
Click to return on the top page