Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Podiatrists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 (SB0169)
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0169 (HB0182)
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 /CH0123
Title
State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0182 (SB0169) Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0169 (HB0182) Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0247 /CH0123 State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:26 PM
Click to return on the top page