Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pleas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0412 (SB0392)
Title
State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy – Plea Agreements and Annual Report (The Judicial Transparency Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 (SB0265)
Title
Probation Before Judgment - Probation Agreements - Probation Not Deportation
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429 (SB0763/CH0141)
Title
Collection and Publication of Criminal Case and Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 (HB0559)
Title
Probation Before Judgment – Probation Agreements – Probation Not Deportation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 (HB0412)
Title
State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy - Annual Report and Data Dashboard (The Judicial Transparency Act of 2022)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429)
Title
Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767
Title
Criminal Procedure - Human Trafficking - Vacatur and Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0412 (SB0392) State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy – Plea Agreements and Annual Report (The Judicial Transparency Act of 2022) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0559 (SB0265) Probation Before Judgment - Probation Agreements - Probation Not Deportation Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until next session (Senator Ready) Adopted
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1429 (SB0763/CH0141) Collection and Publication of Criminal Case and Prosecutorial Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0265 (HB0559) Probation Before Judgment – Probation Agreements – Probation Not Deportation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0392 (HB0412) State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy - Annual Report and Data Dashboard (The Judicial Transparency Act of 2022) President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 /CH0141 (HB1429) Public Safety and Criminal Justice - Transparency and Accountability Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0767 Criminal Procedure - Human Trafficking - Vacatur and Expungement Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 4:51 PM
Click to return on the top page