Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Planning, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0039 (SB0608)
Title
Report on the Public or Private Conversion of State Property to Affordable Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179
Title
Workgroup on Food Environments
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0705
Title
Land Use - Reporting - Annual Reports and Development of New Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0708
Title
Comprehensive Climate Solutions
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0927 /CH0336 (SB0744/CH0337)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1216
Title
Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259 (SB0871)
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0128
Title
Charles County - Program Open Space - Waldorf Core Zone
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608 (HB0039)
Title
Report on the Public or Private Conversion of State Property to Affordable Housing
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 /CH0337 (HB0927/CH0336)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1259)
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928
Title
Department of Planning - Maryland Humanities Council - Appropriation for the Strengthening Humanities Investment in Nonprofits for Equity (SHINE) Grantmaking Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0039 (SB0608) Report on the Public or Private Conversion of State Property to Affordable Housing Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0179 Workgroup on Food Environments Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0705 Land Use - Reporting - Annual Reports and Development of New Housing Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0708 Comprehensive Climate Solutions Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0927 /CH0336 (SB0744/CH0337) Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1216 Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Fund Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1259 (SB0871) Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0128 Charles County - Program Open Space - Waldorf Core Zone Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0608 (HB0039) Report on the Public or Private Conversion of State Property to Affordable Housing Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0744 /CH0337 (HB0927/CH0336) Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1259) Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0928 Department of Planning - Maryland Humanities Council - Appropriation for the Strengthening Humanities Investment in Nonprofits for Equity (SHINE) Grantmaking Initiative Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/23/2022 4:16 PM
Click to return on the top page