Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Places of Worship -see also- Religion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474 /CH0755
Title
St. Mary's County - Leonardtown - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Place of Worship Distance Restriction
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575
Title
Public Safety – Emergency Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676
Title
Handgun Permits - Qualifications - High-Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835
Title
Retail Service Stations – New Construction – Setbacks and Electric Charging Stations
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338
Title
Face Mask Requirements - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Public Safety - States of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Treatment of Religious Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465 (SB0982)
Title
Kent County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0982 (HB1465)
Title
Kent County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0474 /CH0755 St. Mary's County - Leonardtown - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Place of Worship Distance Restriction St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 755
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 Public Safety – Emergency Limitations (Consent of the Governed Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0676 Handgun Permits - Qualifications - High-Risk Occupations Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0835 Retail Service Stations – New Construction – Setbacks and Electric Charging Stations Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1338 Face Mask Requirements - Prohibition Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1371 Public Safety - States of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergencies - Treatment of Religious Organizations Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1465 (SB0982) Kent County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0982 (HB1465) Kent County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:25 PM
Click to return on the top page