Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Places of Worship -see also- Religion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391 (SB0429/CH0862)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547 (SB1158)
Title
Crime of Violence - Educational Facilities, Medical Facilities, and Places of Worship - Penalty (Sacred Places Safety Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Alston
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 /CH0414 (SB0575/CH0415)
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0694 (SB0482/CH0408)
Title
Governor's Office for Children - Engaging Neighborhoods, Organizations, Unions, Governments, and Households (ENOUGH) Grant Program (ENOUGH Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 /CH0244 (SB0537)
Title
Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0817 /CH1022 (SB0066/CH1023)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of License Near a Place of Worship or School PG 307-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847 (SB1139)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class A License - Food Retailers
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 /CH1026 (SB1100/CH1027)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1382
Title
Corporations and Associations - Methodist Church Trust Requirement - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 /CH1023 (HB0817/CH1022)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of License Near a Place of Worship or School
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 /CH0862 (HB0391)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0482 /CH0408 (HB0694)
Title
Governor's Office for Children - Engaging Neighborhoods, Organizations, Unions, Governments, and Households (ENOUGH) Grant Program (ENOUGH Act of 2024)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0537 (HB0805/CH0244)
Title
Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0575 /CH0415 (HB0664/CH0414)
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1100 /CH1027 (HB1052/CH1026)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1139 (HB0847)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class A License - Food Retailers
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1150
Title
Crime of Violence - Educational Facilities, Medical Facilities, and Places of Worship - Penalty (Sacred Places Safety Act)
Sponsor
Senator Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1158 (HB0547)
Title
Crime of Violence - Educational Facilities, Medical Facilities, and Places of Worship - Penalty (Sacred Places Safety Act)
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0391 (SB0429/CH0862) Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington Delegate Morgan, T. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0547 (SB1158) Crime of Violence - Educational Facilities, Medical Facilities, and Places of Worship - Penalty (Sacred Places Safety Act) Delegate Alston 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0664 /CH0414 (SB0575/CH0415) Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0694 (SB0482/CH0408) Governor's Office for Children - Engaging Neighborhoods, Organizations, Unions, Governments, and Households (ENOUGH) Grant Program (ENOUGH Act of 2024) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
2/28/2024 - 12:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0805 /CH0244 (SB0537) Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Economic Matters
2/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0817 /CH1022 (SB0066/CH1023) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of License Near a Place of Worship or School PG 307-24 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1022
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0847 (SB1139) Alcoholic Beverages - Class A License - Food Retailers Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1052 /CH1026 (SB1100/CH1027) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1026
Economic Matters
2/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1382 Corporations and Associations - Methodist Church Trust Requirement - Repeal Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0066 /CH1023 (HB0817/CH1022) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of License Near a Place of Worship or School Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1023
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0429 /CH0862 (HB0391) Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 862
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0482 /CH0408 (HB0694) Governor's Office for Children - Engaging Neighborhoods, Organizations, Unions, Governments, and Households (ENOUGH) Grant Program (ENOUGH Act of 2024) President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/01/2024 - 9:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0537 (HB0805/CH0244) Cannabis - Licensee Locations - Restrictions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Finance
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0575 /CH0415 (HB0664/CH0414) Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) Senator Corderman 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1100 /CH1027 (HB1052/CH1026) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 46th Alcoholic Beverages District - Revisions Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1027
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB1139 (HB0847) Alcoholic Beverages - Class A License - Food Retailers Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1150 Crime of Violence - Educational Facilities, Medical Facilities, and Places of Worship - Penalty (Sacred Places Safety Act) Senator Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Rules
SB1158 (HB0547) Crime of Violence - Educational Facilities, Medical Facilities, and Places of Worship - Penalty (Sacred Places Safety Act) Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page