Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Physical Therapists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
Alternative Education Options - Right to Learn and Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today Programs (Right to Learn Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974 (SB0725)
Title
Health Insurance - Physical Therapy - Copayments, Coinsurance, and Deductibles
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231
Title
Public Schools - Student Health Professional Retention Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139
Title
Public Health - Semipublic Pools - Lifeguards
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 /CH0225
Title
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB0974)
Title
Health Insurance - Physical Therapy - Copayments, Coinsurance, and Deductibles
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0737 Alternative Education Options - Right to Learn and Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today Programs (Right to Learn Act of 2022) Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 (SB0725) Health Insurance - Physical Therapy - Copayments, Coinsurance, and Deductibles Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1231 Public Schools - Student Health Professional Retention Program - Established Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 Public Health - Semipublic Pools - Lifeguards Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0209 /CH0225 State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Sunset Extension Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0725 (HB0974) Health Insurance - Physical Therapy - Copayments, Coinsurance, and Deductibles Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:33 AM
Click to return on the top page