Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Physical Therapists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 /CH0473 (SB0517/CH0474)
Title
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 /CH0775 (SB0384/CH0776)
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998
Title
County Boards of Education - In-Person Instruction and Related Services - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1039 /CH0491 (SB0745/CH0492)
Title
Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0384 /CH0776 (HB0652/CH0775)
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0517 /CH0474 (HB0210/CH0473)
Title
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0745 /CH0492 (HB1039/CH0491)
Title
Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0210 /CH0473 (SB0517/CH0474) State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 473
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0652 /CH0775 (SB0384/CH0776) Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting Delegate Qi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 775
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0998 County Boards of Education - In-Person Instruction and Related Services - Requirement Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1039 /CH0491 (SB0745/CH0492) Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Revisions Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0384 /CH0776 (HB0652/CH0775) Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 776
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0517 /CH0474 (HB0210/CH0473) State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 474
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0745 /CH0492 (HB1039/CH0491) Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Revisions Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:08 PM
Click to return on the top page