Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Physician Assistants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0260 (SB0305)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676
Title
Handgun Permits - Qualifications - High-Risk Occupations
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961 (SB0808)
Title
Health Occupations – Physician Assistants – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1208 /CH0675
Title
Health Occupations - Health Care Workforce Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1252 (SB0972)
Title
Physicians and Allied Health Professions - Reorganization and Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1412 (SB0740/CH0340)
Title
Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1464 /CH0396 (SB0626/CH0395)
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 (HB0260)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626 /CH0395 (HB1464/CH0396)
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661 /CH0372
Title
Pharmacists - Status as Health Care Providers and Study on Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740 /CH0340 (HB1412)
Title
Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0808 (HB0961)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0972 (HB1252)
Title
Physicians and Allied Health Professions – Reorganization and Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0260 (SB0305) State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0676 Handgun Permits - Qualifications - High-Risk Occupations Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0961 (SB0808) Health Occupations – Physician Assistants – Revisions Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1208 /CH0675 Health Occupations - Health Care Workforce Expansion Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2022 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1252 (SB0972) Physicians and Allied Health Professions - Reorganization and Revisions Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1412 (SB0740/CH0340) Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2022 - 2:30 PM
Rules
HB1464 /CH0396 (SB0626/CH0395) Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Alterations Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0305 (HB0260) State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0626 /CH0395 (HB1464/CH0396) Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Alterations Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0661 /CH0372 Pharmacists - Status as Health Care Providers and Study on Reimbursement Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0740 /CH0340 (HB1412) Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0808 (HB0961) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Revisions Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0972 (HB1252) Physicians and Allied Health Professions – Reorganization and Revisions Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/2/2022 4:23 PM
Click to return on the top page