Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Photography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145
Title
Criminal Law - Deep Fake Representations and Revenge Porn
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0288 (SB0555)
Title
Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Private Place and Minor Victim
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0387 /CH0203
Title
Public Information Act – Surveillance Images – Illegal Dumping in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0491
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation and Department of General Services - Property Appraisal Aids - Geographic Images
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0703
Title
Juvenile Law - Police Record Concerning a Child - Confidentiality Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Embry
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872
Title
Election Law – Campaign Materials – Disclosure of Use of Synthetic Media
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001
Title
Motor Vehicles - Automated Enforcement Programs - Privacy Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Vehicle Laws – Interstate Highways – Interstate Speed Monitoring Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265 (SB1054)
Title
Local Government – Building Permits for Residential Solar Energy and Residential Energy Storage Systems – Required Platform and Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1446 (SB1060)
Title
Railroads - Safety Requirements (Maryland Railway Safety Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1460
Title
Criminal Law – Personal Identifying Information and Images of Minors – Dissemination
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography - Prohibitions and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0101
Title
State and Local Correctional Facilities - Operation of Unmanned Aircraft - Image Recording and Delivery of Contraband
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555 (HB0288)
Title
Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Private Place and Minor Victim
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 /CH0204
Title
Public Information Act - Surveillance Images - Illegal Dumping in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Carter
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0943 /CH0751
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Obstruction - Monitoring Systems Expansion and Workgroup (Better Bus Service Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978
Title
Election Law - Synthetic Media - Disclosure and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1265)
Title
Local Government - Building Permits for Residential Solar Energy and Residential Energy Storage Systems - Required Platform and Inspections
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1060 (HB1446)
Title
Railroads - Safety Requirements (Maryland Railway Safety Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1079 /CH1036 (HB1235/CH1035)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License Extensions
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0145 Criminal Law - Deep Fake Representations and Revenge Porn Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0288 (SB0555) Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Private Place and Minor Victim Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0387 /CH0203 Public Information Act – Surveillance Images – Illegal Dumping in Baltimore City Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0491 State Department of Assessments and Taxation and Department of General Services - Property Appraisal Aids - Geographic Images Delegate Fair 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0703 Juvenile Law - Police Record Concerning a Child - Confidentiality Exception Delegate Embry 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0872 Election Law – Campaign Materials – Disclosure of Use of Synthetic Media Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1001 Motor Vehicles - Automated Enforcement Programs - Privacy Protections Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 Vehicle Laws – Interstate Highways – Interstate Speed Monitoring Systems Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1265 (SB1054) Local Government – Building Permits for Residential Solar Energy and Residential Energy Storage Systems – Required Platform and Inspections Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1446 (SB1060) Railroads - Safety Requirements (Maryland Railway Safety Act of 2024) Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1460 Criminal Law – Personal Identifying Information and Images of Minors – Dissemination Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0065 Criminal Law - Child Pornography - Prohibitions and Penalties Senator James 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 /CH0101 State and Local Correctional Facilities - Operation of Unmanned Aircraft - Image Recording and Delivery of Contraband Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0555 (HB0288) Criminal Law - Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent - Private Place and Minor Victim Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0643 /CH0204 Public Information Act - Surveillance Images - Illegal Dumping in Baltimore City Senator Carter 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2024 - 10:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0943 /CH0751 Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Obstruction - Monitoring Systems Expansion and Workgroup (Better Bus Service Act of 2024) Senator Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 751
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0978 Election Law - Synthetic Media - Disclosure and Regulation Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1054 (HB1265) Local Government - Building Permits for Residential Solar Energy and Residential Energy Storage Systems - Required Platform and Inspections Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1060 (HB1446) Railroads - Safety Requirements (Maryland Railway Safety Act of 2024) Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1079 /CH1036 (HB1235/CH1035) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License Extensions Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1036
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:52 PM
Click to return on the top page