Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Photography

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053 /CH0468
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dedicated Bus Lanes - Prohibition and Monitoring Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073 /CH0171
Title
Baltimore City – Complete Streets and Safe Routes to School Programs – Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151
Title
Traffic Control Device Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259 (SB0335)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Reciprocal Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629
Title
Election Law - Polling Places and Early Voting Centers - Electronic Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968 /CH0364 (SB0714)
Title
Health Occupations – Dental Assistants – Certification and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046 (SB0762)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1119
Title
Election Law – Polling Places and Early Voting Centers – Aerial Pictures of Electioneering Boundary
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1431
Title
Public High Schools - Student Athletes - Compensation for Name, Image, and Likeness
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463
Title
Biometric Authentication Requirements for Governmental Services - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163
Title
Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 (HB0259)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762 (HB1046)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0053 /CH0468 Vehicle Laws - Dedicated Bus Lanes - Prohibition and Monitoring Systems Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0073 /CH0171 Baltimore City – Complete Streets and Safe Routes to School Programs – Funding Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0151 Traffic Control Device Monitoring Systems - Authorization Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0259 (SB0335) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0469 Motor Vehicle Administration - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Reciprocal Agreements Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0629 Election Law - Polling Places and Early Voting Centers - Electronic Devices Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0968 /CH0364 (SB0714) Health Occupations – Dental Assistants – Certification and Regulation Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1046 (SB0762) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1119 Election Law – Polling Places and Early Voting Centers – Aerial Pictures of Electioneering Boundary Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1431 Public High Schools - Student Athletes - Compensation for Name, Image, and Likeness Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1463 Biometric Authentication Requirements for Governmental Services - Prohibition Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0163 Election Law - Ballots - Processing and Reporting Procedures Senator Kagan 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0335 (HB0259) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers Privacy Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0762 (HB1046) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 10:54 AM
Click to return on the top page