Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pest Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263
Title
Real Property – Nuisance Actions – Rodent Harborage
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0387 (SB0268)
Title
Pesticide Regulation - Transfer to Department of the Environment
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0570
Title
Pesticides – Mosquito Control Products and PFAS Chemicals
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 /CH0339
Title
State Conservation Land - Old-Growth Forests - Management
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1069
Title
Maryland Bedbug Detection and Treatment Act
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 /CH0475 (SB0695/CH0476)
Title
Natural Resources - Voluntary Firewood Treatment Certification Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0387)
Title
Pesticide Regulation - Transfer to Department of the Environment
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0529
Title
Real Property – Landlord and Tenant – Bedbugs
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 /CH0476 (HB1140/CH0475)
Title
Natural Resources - Voluntary Firewood Treatment Certification Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0263 Real Property – Nuisance Actions – Rodent Harborage Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0387 (SB0268) Pesticide Regulation - Transfer to Department of the Environment Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0570 Pesticides – Mosquito Control Products and PFAS Chemicals Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0884 /CH0339 State Conservation Land - Old-Growth Forests - Management Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1069 Maryland Bedbug Detection and Treatment Act Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1140 /CH0475 (SB0695/CH0476) Natural Resources - Voluntary Firewood Treatment Certification Program - Establishment Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0268 (HB0387) Pesticide Regulation - Transfer to Department of the Environment Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0529 Real Property – Landlord and Tenant – Bedbugs Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0695 /CH0476 (HB1140/CH0475) Natural Resources - Voluntary Firewood Treatment Certification Program - Establishment Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page