Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Pest Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 (SB0375)
Title
Agriculture – Neonicotinoid Pesticides – Sale and Storage
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025
Title
Pesticides – Carbofuran – Collection, Disposal, and Prohibition on Possession or Storage
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 (HB0208)
Title
Agriculture – Neonicotinoid Pesticides – Sale and Storage
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0208 (SB0375) Agriculture – Neonicotinoid Pesticides – Sale and Storage Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0581 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB1025 Pesticides – Carbofuran – Collection, Disposal, and Prohibition on Possession or Storage Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0375 (HB0208) Agriculture – Neonicotinoid Pesticides – Sale and Storage Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0486 (HB0581) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:20 PM
Click to return on the top page