Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Personal Representatives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0258 (SB0416)
Title
Renewable Energy - Customer-Sited Solar Program
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 /CH0315 (SB0075/CH0314)
Title
Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325 /CH0316 (SB0164/CH0317)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 /CH0319 (SB0080/CH0318)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Estates and Trusts - Estate Administration - Publication of Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Embry
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1518
Title
Estates and Trusts - Interpretation of Wills - Extrinsic Evidence of Intent (Granny's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075 /CH0314 (HB0324/CH0315)
Title
Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 /CH0318 (HB0326/CH0319)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164 /CH0317 (HB0325/CH0316)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 (HB0258)
Title
Renewable Energy - Customer-Sited Solar Program
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0798
Title
Stream Restoration Contractors Licensing Board, Stream Restoration Contractors, and Stream Restoration Project Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0258 (SB0416) Renewable Energy - Customer-Sited Solar Program Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0324 /CH0315 (SB0075/CH0314) Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0325 /CH0316 (SB0164/CH0317) Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0326 /CH0319 (SB0080/CH0318) Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1258 Estates and Trusts - Estate Administration - Publication of Notice Delegate Embry 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1518 Estates and Trusts - Interpretation of Wills - Extrinsic Evidence of Intent (Granny's Law) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0075 /CH0314 (HB0324/CH0315) Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2024 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0080 /CH0318 (HB0326/CH0319) Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
SB0164 /CH0317 (HB0325/CH0316) Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2024 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0416 (HB0258) Renewable Energy - Customer-Sited Solar Program Senator Lewis Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0798 Stream Restoration Contractors Licensing Board, Stream Restoration Contractors, and Stream Restoration Project Requirements Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2024 11:50 AM
Click to return on the top page