Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Personal Representatives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 /CH0716
Title
Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216
Title
Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 /CH0630
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives - Payment of Commissions and Attorney's Fees Without Court Approval
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 /CH0716 Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees Delegate Terrasa 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716
Judiciary
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0216 Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0468 /CH0630 Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives - Payment of Commissions and Attorney's Fees Without Court Approval Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 630
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:27 PM
Click to return on the top page