Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Perjury

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0671
Title
Public Information Act – Personnel and Investigatory Records – Complaints Against Police Officers
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166
Title
Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Report Misconduct (Maryland Police Accountability Act)
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626 (HB0139)
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0671 Public Information Act – Personnel and Investigatory Records – Complaints Against Police Officers Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0166 Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Report Misconduct (Maryland Police Accountability Act) Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0626 (HB0139) Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/12/2021 5:51 PM
Click to return on the top page