Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Pedestrians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 (SB0077)
Title
Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Authorizations and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 (SB0593)
Title
Transportation - Maryland Transportation Authority - Pedestrian and Bicycle Safety and Accessibility
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263
Title
State Highway Administration - Sidewalks and Bicycle Pathways - Maintenance and Repair
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 (SB0345/CH0603)
Title
Transportation - Vision Zero - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0530 (SB0645)
Title
Maryland Trails Advisory Committee and the Maryland Office of Trails - Establishment (Great Maryland Trails Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 /CH0705 (SB0471)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 /CH0676
Title
Montgomery County - School Bus Stops MC 6-24
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 (SB0681)
Title
Major Highway Capacity Expansion Projects - Impact Assessments and Workgroup (Transportation and Climate Alignment Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Edelson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065 /CH0746 (SB0774/CH0747)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Entertainment District Security Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413
Title
Prince George's County - Development Authority - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Alston
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 (HB0111)
Title
Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Authorizations and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200
Title
Counties - Construction of Sidewalks and Crosswalks - Safe Alternative Routes to Public Schools
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0345 /CH0603 (HB0344)
Title
Transportation - Vision Zero - Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 (HB0575/CH0705)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB0135)
Title
Transportation - Maryland Transportation Authority - Pedestrian and Bicycle Safety and Accessibility
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0645 (HB0530)
Title
Maryland Trails Advisory Committee and the Maryland Office of Trails - Establishment (Great Maryland Trails Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681 (HB0836)
Title
Major Highway Capacity Expansion Projects - Impact Assessments and Mitigation Plans (Transportation and Climate Alignment Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 /CH0747 (HB1065/CH0746)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Entertainment District Security Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0111 (SB0077) Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Authorizations and Requirements Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0135 (SB0593) Transportation - Maryland Transportation Authority - Pedestrian and Bicycle Safety and Accessibility Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0263 State Highway Administration - Sidewalks and Bicycle Pathways - Maintenance and Repair Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0344 (SB0345/CH0603) Transportation - Vision Zero - Implementation Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0530 (SB0645) Maryland Trails Advisory Committee and the Maryland Office of Trails - Establishment (Great Maryland Trails Act) Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 /CH0705 (SB0471) Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024) Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0761 /CH0676 Montgomery County - School Bus Stops MC 6-24 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 676
Environment and Transportation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0836 (SB0681) Major Highway Capacity Expansion Projects - Impact Assessments and Workgroup (Transportation and Climate Alignment Act of 2024) Delegate Edelson 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator King) Adopted
Appropriations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB1065 /CH0746 (SB0774/CH0747) Public Safety - Maryland Entertainment District Security Grant Program Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 746
Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1413 Prince George's County - Development Authority - Established Delegate Alston 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 (HB0111) Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles - Authorizations and Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0200 Counties - Construction of Sidewalks and Crosswalks - Safe Alternative Routes to Public Schools Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0345 /CH0603 (HB0344) Transportation - Vision Zero - Implementation Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 (HB0575/CH0705) Criminal Procedure - Victim Compensation - Alterations (Victim Compensation Reform Act of 2024) President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0593 (HB0135) Transportation - Maryland Transportation Authority - Pedestrian and Bicycle Safety and Accessibility Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0645 (HB0530) Maryland Trails Advisory Committee and the Maryland Office of Trails - Establishment (Great Maryland Trails Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/16/2024 - 9:00 AM
SB0681 (HB0836) Major Highway Capacity Expansion Projects - Impact Assessments and Mitigation Plans (Transportation and Climate Alignment Act of 2024) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Finance
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0774 /CH0747 (HB1065/CH0746) Public Safety - Maryland Entertainment District Security Grant Program Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 747
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:38 PM
Click to return on the top page