Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Pedestrians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 (SB0843)
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487
Title
Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 (SB0726/CH0351)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1047
Title
Mail–In Voting Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1293 /CH0080 (SB0783/CH0081)
Title
Baltimore City - West North Avenue Development Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783 /CH0081 (HB1293/CH0080)
Title
Baltimore City – West North Avenue Development Authority
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 (HB0067)
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 (SB0843) I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
Finance
HB0487 Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0595 (SB0726/CH0351) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1047 Mail–In Voting Enhancement Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Refuses to Recede
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1293 /CH0080 (SB0783/CH0081) Baltimore City - West North Avenue Development Authority Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0097 Purple Line Marketing Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0783 /CH0081 (HB1293/CH0080) Baltimore City – West North Avenue Development Authority Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Finance
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0843 (HB0067) I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/1/2021 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page