Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Orphans' Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681 /CH0525
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 22-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1066
Title
Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250
Title
Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0681 /CH0525 Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts Delegate Buckel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 525
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2021 - 1:45 PM
HB0767 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 22-21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1066 Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1250 Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland Delegate Malone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2021 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:18 PM
Click to return on the top page