Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Organ Donorship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation - Financial Status
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370 /CH0274
Title
Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund - Annual Funding and Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574 /CH0273
Title
Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund - Annual Funding and Extension
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0096 Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation - Financial Status Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2022 - 3:00 PM
HB1370 /CH0274 Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund - Annual Funding and Extension Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0574 /CH0273 Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund - Annual Funding and Extension Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Budget and Taxation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:45 AM
Click to return on the top page