Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Opioids -see also- Controlled Dangerous Substances; Drugs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408 (SB0394/CH0239)
Title
Statewide Targeted Overdose Prevention (STOP) Act of 2022
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 /CH0270
Title
Public Health – Opioid Restitution Fund Advisory Council
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1086 /CH0084 (SB0419/CH0085)
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds and Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - State-Subdivision Agreement and Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Prescribers of Opioids - Notification Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Correctional Services - Pregnant Incarcerated Individuals - Substance Abuse Assessment and Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0394 /CH0239 (HB0408)
Title
Statewide Targeted Overdose Prevention (STOP) Act of 2022
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419 /CH0085 (HB1086/CH0084)
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds and Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances and Treatment of Chronic Pain and Long-Term Oxygen Use Patients (Continuity of Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0408 (SB0394/CH0239) Statewide Targeted Overdose Prevention (STOP) Act of 2022 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0794 /CH0270 Public Health – Opioid Restitution Fund Advisory Council Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1086 /CH0084 (SB0419/CH0085) Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds and Grant Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1087 Opioid Restitution Fund - State-Subdivision Agreement and Grant Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB1111 Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Prescribers of Opioids - Notification Requirement Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1120 Correctional Services - Pregnant Incarcerated Individuals - Substance Abuse Assessment and Treatment Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0394 /CH0239 (HB0408) Statewide Targeted Overdose Prevention (STOP) Act of 2022 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Finance
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0419 /CH0085 (HB1086/CH0084) Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds and Grant Program Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Finance
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0865 Controlled Dangerous Substances and Treatment of Chronic Pain and Long-Term Oxygen Use Patients (Continuity of Care Act of 2022) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:44 AM
Click to return on the top page