Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Ombudsmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0389 /CH0155 (SB0487/CH0156)
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 (SB0512)
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0793
Title
County Boards of Education - Community Ombudsman - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 /CH0156 (HB0389/CH0155)
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512 (HB0604)
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0389 /CH0155 (SB0487/CH0156) Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2022 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0604 (SB0512) Office of the Attorney General - Correctional Ombudsman Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0793 County Boards of Education - Community Ombudsman - Established Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0487 /CH0156 (HB0389/CH0155) Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Revisions Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0512 (HB0604) Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:08 AM
Click to return on the top page